MS HR76 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Charleston High School "tigers" Football Team And Head Coach Ladon Taylor For Winning The 2023 Mississippi High School Activities Association 2a State Football Championship.
Title
Charleston High School Tigers Football Team; commend for winning the 2023 MHSAA Class 2A State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |