MS HR69 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Recognizing And Commending Bishop Dr. Arnold Stanton, Sr., For Reaching Several Significant Milestones While Faithfully Serving In The Ministry.
Title
Bishop Dr. Arnold Stanton, Sr.; commend upon reaching several significant milestones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred To Rules |