MS HR62 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The New Albany High School "lady Bulldogs" Golf Team For Winning The 2022 Mississippi High School Activities Association (mhsaa) Class 4a State Golf Championship.
Title
New Albany High School "Lady Bulldogs" Golf Team; commend upon winnning the 2022 MHSAA Class 4A State Golf Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-02-15 | House | Adopted |
2023-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred To Rules |