MS HR55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Honoring The Life And Legacy Of Dr. Gustavus Adolphus "sonny" Rush Iii And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Dr. G.A. "Sonny" Rush; honor life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred To Rules |