MS HR52 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2020-2021 Florence High School Lady Eagles Soccer Team, Head Coach Bill Hood And Assistant Coach Joshua Cavanaugh Upon Winning Their Fourth Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 4a Girls Soccer State Championship.
Title
Florence High School Lady Eagles Soccer Team; commend upon winning MHSAA Class 4A State Soccer Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred To Rules |