MS HR48 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Pearl High School Pirates Boys Soccer Team And Head Coach Chris Rash Upon Winning Their Tenth Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 5a Boys Soccer State Championship.
Title
Pearl High School Pirates Boys Soccer Team; commend upon winning 10th MHSAA Class 5A Soccer State championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Rogers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-06 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred To Rules |