MS HR33 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Scott Central "rebels" Football Team And Head Coach Jeff Stockstill For Winning Back-to-back Mississippi High School Activities Association(mhsaa) Class 2a State Championships.
Title
Scott Central High School "Rebels" Football Team; commend upon winning the 2022 MHSAA Class 2A State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |