MS HR32 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Congratulating Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., On The Occasion Of Its Policy Impact "2019 Aka Day At The Mississippi State Capitol" To Mobilize The Ivy For Civil Rights And Social Justice With Special Emphasis On Voter Empowerment.
Title
2019 "Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority Day at the Capitol"; observe on February 7, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. Gregory Holloway [D] |
Rep. Otis Anthony [D] | Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D] | Rep. Abe Hudson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Rules |