MS HR149 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The West Harrison High School Hurricanes Cheerleading Team For Winning The 2022 Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 5a State Cheerleading Championship And For Placing Second At The Uca Nationals Competition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

West Harrison High School Hurricanes Cheerleading Team; commend upon winning MHSAA Class 5A State Championship and placing 2nd at UCA Nationals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-23HouseImmediate Release
2023-03-23HouseAdopted
2023-03-22HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2023-03-21HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback