MS HR14 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Mr. Mack Elmore Banks And Expressing Sincerest Sympathy To His Family, Community And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Mr. Mack Elmore Banks; commend life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Roberson [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-02 | House | Adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Rules |