MS HR116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Mr. Casey Marion Smith, Sr., And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family, Colleagues And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Mr. Casey Marion Smith, Sr.; commend life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred To Rules |