MS HR112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Legends Of The Automobile Industry And Extending Our Most Sincere Wishes For Continued Success In All Of Their Future Endeavors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legends of the automobile industry; commend successes of.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-21HouseAdopted
2019-03-20HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-19HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback