MS HC97 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Cathy Chen Of Oxford, Mississippi, A Student At Oxford High School, For Receiving The 2010 Siemens Award For Advanced Placement In Math, Science And Technology For Mississippi.
Title
Cathy Chen; commend on being named recipient of the 2010 Siemens Award for Advanced Placement in Math, Science and Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-17 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-17 | Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-16 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-16 | Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Referred To Rules |