MS HC96 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Distinguished And Meritorious Law Enforcement Career Of Jackson Police Chief Lee Vance Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chief Lee Vance; commend dedicated and meritorious career upon his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-27SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-27SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-27SenateAdopted
2019-03-26SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-22SenateReferred To Rules
2019-03-22HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-22HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-22HouseAdopted
2019-03-22HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback