MS HC80 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating The Links, Incorporated, On The Observance Of The "mississippi Links Day At The Capitol 2019" For Their Outstanding Service To The Community Under The Program Initiative, "transforming Communities - Fulfilling Our Purpose."
Title
Mississippi Links Day at the Capitol 2019; commemorate observance of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred To Rules |