MS HC148 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Aaron E. Henry Community Health Services Center, Inc., For Its Commitment To Health Care And Partnering With The Heinz Family Philanthropic Foundation.
Title
Aaron E. Henry Community Health Services Center, Inc.; commend commitment to health care and partnering with the Heinz Family Philanthropic Foundation.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Espy [D] | Rep. Joe Gardner [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Adopted | |
2010-04-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Referred To Rules |