MS HC136 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Prolific Service Of Reverend Donald E. Wildmon As Founder And Chairman Emeritus Of The American Family Association And American Family Radio, Acknowledging The Great Strides Made By The Organization To Promote Family Decency And Congratulating Him Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Reverend Donald E. Wildmon; commend prolific service provided to the American Family Association and upon his retirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Aldridge [R] | Rep. Mark DuVall [D] | Rep. Stephen Holland [D] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] |
Rep. Greg Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-22 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-22 | Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Referred To Rules |