MS HC124 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mr. Trent Harmon Upon Being Named The 2016 American Idol.
Title
Trent Harmon; commend upon winning American Idol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred To Rules |