MS HB949 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17-17-227, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That No Solid Waste Management Plan Shall Include Any Proposed New Municipal Solid Waste Landfill If The New Landfill Is Located Within A Certain County Having Two Or More Existing Permitted Municipal Solid Waste Landfills And Such New Landfill Will Be Located Within A Five-mile Radius Of An Existing Municipal Solid Waste Landfill, Unless A Referendum Election Has Been Conducted And Approved; To Amend Section 17-17-229, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Facility Permit Grant Or Loan May Not Be Issued By Any Agency Of The State For Any New Municipal Solid Waste Landfill If The New Landfill Is Located Within A Certain County Having Two Or More Existing Permitted Municipal Solid Waste Landfills And Such New Landfill Will Be Located Within A Five-mile Radius Of An Existing Municipal Solid Waste Landfill, Unless A Referendum Has Been Conducted And Approved; To Create New Section 17-17-237, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Referendum Process; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Solid waste landfills; prohibit new landfill in county where 2 or more exist, unless referendum held.
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Ford [R] | Rep. Edward Blackmon [D] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-03 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs |
2021-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-10 | House | Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 17 | 227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 17 | 229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |