MS HB945 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 31-3-3, 31-3-5 And 31-3-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The State Board Of Contractors, Provide For The Organization And Administration Of The Board And Provide For An Executive Secretary For The Board; To Bring Forward Sections 73-59-1, 73-59-5, 73-59-7, 73-59-9, 73-59-17, 73-59-19 And 73-59-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Licensing And Regulation Of Residential Builders And Remodelers; To Amend Sections 73-59-3, 73-59-11, 73-59-13 And 73-59-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain License Requirements, Powers And Duties, Hearing Provisions And Exemptions Regarding Residential Builders And Remodelers; To Amend Section 31-3-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Definitions For The State Board Of Public Contractors; To Amend Section 31-3-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Board To Issue Restricted Certificates Of Responsibility For Certain Projects; To Prohibit Municipalities And Counties From Requiring Additional Testing Once A Contractor Has Received His Or Her Certificate Of Responsibility; To Amend Sections 27-17-457 And 17-25-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 14, Chapter 345, Laws Of 2000, As Amended By Section 13, Chapter 375, Laws Of 2005, As Amended By Section 13, Chapter 556, Laws Of 2009, To Extend The Repealer On Residential Remodelers And Rebuilders; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Contractors, remodelers and rebuilders; revise certain provisions and licensing requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Died On Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-02-02 | DR - TSDPCS: AP To JB | |
2010-01-28 | DR - TSDPCS: JB To AP | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Judiciary B;Appropriations |