MS HB942 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 77-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Declare That It Is The Policy Of The State Of Mississippi To Support Deployment Of Existing And Emerging Technologies To Foster Reliable And Resilient Service And Customer Access To Enhanced Services; To Provide That The Public Service Commission Is Authorized And Empowered To Enter Into Contracts With Federal Agencies, Including, But Not Limited To, The United States Department Of Commerce, The Federal Communications Commission And The National Telecommunications Information Agency, Or State Agencies, For The Purposes Only Of Providing Services For The Collection Of Data For Mapping Of Broadband Availability; To Amend Section 77-3-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Definitions Of "broadband Service Provider," "broadband Operator," "electric Delivery System" And "enhanced Grid Investments"; To Amend Section 77-3-44, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Fiber-optic Infrastructure And Enhanced Grid Investments As An Economic Development Activity, To Allow Rate-regulated Electric Utilities To Permit Broadband Providers Use Of The Electric Delivery System To Provide Broadband Services, To Regulate Easements, To Allow Certain Entities To Construct Fiber-optic Infrastructure On Public Utilities' Existing Rights-of-way; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities; authorize rate-regulated electric utilities to permit broadband provider use of the electric delivery system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateDied On Calendar
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-18SenateReferred To Energy
2021-02-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-09HousePassed
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Public Utilities

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77344Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback