MS HB940 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize A Financial Institution To Delay The Completion Of A Financial Transaction, If Certain Employees Of The Financial Institution Believe In Good Faith That A Requested Transaction May Result In, Or Be The Result Of, Exploitation Of An Eligible Person; To Provide That A Transaction Delay Will Expire Upon Either A Good-faith Determination By The Financial Institution That The Transaction Will Not Result In Exploitation, Or 10 Calendar Days, Unless The Department Of Human Services Or A Law Enforcement Authority Requests That The Financial Institution Extend The Delay; To Require The Financial Institution To Notify The Department Of Human Services And Authorize The Financial Institution To Notify Other Certain Individuals If A Transaction Is Delayed; To Limit The Liability Of A Financial Institution That Either Delays A Transaction Or Does Not Delay A Transaction; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Financial institutions; authorize to delay a transaction upon good-faith belief that eligible person will be exploited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |