MS HB931 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-573, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Affidavit Ballot Procedures; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Affidavit ballots; clarify procedures for accepting and handling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2015/pdf/history/HB/HB0931.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2015/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0931IN.htm |