MS HB928 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Commissioner Of The Department Of Corrections To Designate An Executive Deputy Commissioner; To Amend Section 47-5-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Executive Deputy Commissioner Shall Be Directly Responsible To The Commissioner Of Corrections; To Amend Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Members Of The Parole Board Shall Receive Compensation Or Per Diem In Addition To Their Salaries; To Amend Section 97-37-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand Authorization For Certificates Of Rehabilitation For Persons Convicted Of Crimes Under Federal Law, In State Military Court Or In Other States; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commissioner of Corrections and community corrections; bring forward various sections relating to.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Horan, Mickens, Bell (65th)) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Wiggins,Simmons (12th) |
2021-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Cockerham,Felsher |
2021-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: CR To AC |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Corrections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-02-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Horan, Mickens) |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-04 | House | Amended |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 5 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 37 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |