MS HB927 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-1-87, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of The Department Of Corrections To Request Unmarked Vehicles Where The Presence Of Identifying Marks Would Hinder Official Investigations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State-owned vehicles, MDOC Commissioner may request unmarked vehicle for use in official investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2014-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed |
2014-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Corrections |