MS HB923 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-20)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-20)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 49-4-37 And 57-61-32, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Designate The Fish Hatchery That Is Located In North Mississippi As The Bob Tyler Fish Hatchery; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bob Tyler Fish Hatchery; designate the fish hatchery located in North Mississippi as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Whaley,Suber,Sparks |
2023-03-16 | House | Conferees Named Weathersby,Holloway,Newman |
2023-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2023-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Public Property |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 4 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 61 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |