MS HB920 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Corrections To Create The Inmate Incentive To Work Program; To Provide That The Program Shall Provide Payment To Eligible Inmates Housed In State Correctional Facilities; To Create A Special Fund Entitled "the Inmate Incentive To Work Program Fund", Which Shall Be Funded By A Portion Of The Inmate Welfare Fund; To Amend Section 47-5-158, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Inmate Welfare Fund; authorize portion of fund to be used to fund Inmate Incentive to Work Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DR - TSDP: CR To AP |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Corrections;Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To CN |
2022-01-24 | House | DR - TSDP: CN To AP |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Corrections;Appropriations |