MS HB917 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "home-based Opportunity Freedom Act Of 2022"; To Provide Certain Definitions; To Prohibit Any Local Unit Of Government From Adopting Or Enforcing An Ordinance Or Regulation That Restricts A Particular Home-based Occupation Or Activity Or Imposes A Burden On Home-based Work; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Home-based Opportunity Freedom Act of 2022"; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2022-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider W/Drawn |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hobgood-Wilkes, Lamar, Steverson) |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-02 | House | Amended |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |