MS HB900 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create "the Families' Rights And Responsibilities Act"; To Provide The Definitions For The Act; To Prohibit The State Or Any Other Governmental Entity From Substantially Burdening A Parent's Fundamental Right To Direct The Upbringing Of His Or Her Child; To Provide Exceptions To The Prohibition; To Provide That This Act Does Not Give A Parent A Right To Abuse His Or Her Child; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"The Families' Rights and Responsibilities Act"; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02SenateDied In Committee
2024-03-21SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2024-03-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2024-03-12HousePassed
2024-03-12HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2024-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2024-02-02HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback