MS HB852 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Teacher Salary Scale By Increasing The Minimum Salary; To Amend Section 37-21-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Minimum Annual Salary For Teacher Assistants; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers' and teacher's assistants' salaries; provide increase to minimum salary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29 Approved by Governor
2021-03-22SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-22HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-18HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2021-03-08SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-04SenatePassed As Amended
2021-03-04SenateAmended
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-03-02SenateDR - TSDPAA: ED To AP
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-02-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-02-02HouseDR - TSDPCS: AP To ED
2021-01-28HouseDR - TSDPCS: ED To AP
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37217Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback