MS HB848 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Designate A Segment Of Highway In Choctaw County As "the Blackwood Brothers Gospel Highway"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway; designate segment of in Choctaw County as "The Blackwood Brothers Gospel Highway".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-13HouseDied On Calendar
2014-02-04HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-02-04HouseDR - TSDP: AP To TR
2014-01-30HouseDR - TSDP: TR To AP
2014-01-20HouseReferred To Transportation;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback