MS HB842 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Office Of Workforce Development To Partner With The Mississippi Alliance Of Nonprofits And Philanthropy To Create A Prototype System That Will Identify, Document, Network, Assess Needs And Create A Plan For Increasing Accountability, Transparency, Operational Capacity And Information Sharing For Nonprofit Organizations In Mississippi That Are Awarded Grants And Contracts That Use Federal Or State Resources That Are Related To Workforce Development And Employment Services; To Require The Office And The Alliance To Execute A Memorandum Of Understanding Between Them That Details The Scope Of Work, Anticipated Outcomes And The Timeline For Developing The Prototype System; To Require All Agencies, Institutions And Departments That Sub-grant Or Contract With Nonprofits For Workforce Or Employment Services, And Any Nonprofit That Receives Such Sub-grant Or Contract, To Provide Any Information That May Be Requested From The Office Or The Alliance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Office of Workforce Development; authorize to work with MS Alliance of Nonprofits and Philanthropy to create an accountability system for certain nonprofits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: EC To AP |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development;Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Workforce Development |