MS HB842 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Reverse Auction Method For Receiving Bids To Differentiate Between Agencies And Governing Authorities; To Provide That If An Agency Determines That A Reverse Auction Is Not In The Best Interest Of The Agency, Then That Determination Must Be Approved By The Public Procurement Review Board; To Provide That If A Governing Authority Determines That A Reverse Auction Is Not In The Best Interest Of The Governing Authority, Then That Determination Must Be Approved By The Governing Board Of The Governing Authority; To Provide That The Agency And Governing Authority Must Submit An Explanation As To Why A Reverse Auction Is Not In The Best Interest Of The Agency Or Governing Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Reverse auction; revise method of receiving bids through for agencies and governing authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2021-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: MU To CA |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Municipalities;County Affairs |