MS HB837 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require Health Insurance Policies That Provide Pregnancy Related Benefits To Provide Coverage For Medically Necessary Expenses Of Diagnosis And Treatment Of Infertility; To Establish A Pilot Program In The State And School Employees Health Insurance Plan That Provides For Coverage For Medically Necessary Expenses Of Tests And Procedures For The Diagnosis And Treatment Of Infertility; To Amend Section 25-15-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; To Require The State Health Plan To Update Its Policy Regarding Proton Radiation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Health insurance policies; require certain to provide infertility coverage and establish pilot program in State Health Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 95 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Appropriations |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | Point of Order-Not Well Taken |
2020-03-12 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2020-03-12 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred To Insurance |