MS HB814 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
Pending: Senate Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-104-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Contract Entered Into By The Office Of The Attorney General For Experts Retained For Actual Or Prospective Litigation Shall Be Exempt From The Oversight Of The Public Procurement Review Board; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Procurement Review Board; exempt certain contracts entered into by Attorney General's office from oversight of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-11HousePassed
2021-02-10HouseRead the Third Time
2021-02-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-02HouseDR - TSDP: AP To AC
2021-02-02HouseDR - TSDP: AC To AP
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
271047Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback