MS HB811 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Segment Of U.s. Highway 80 In Rankin County, Mississippi, Within The Corporate Limits Of The City Of Brandon, As The "deputy Travis O. Biddle Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Certain Segment Of United States Highway 80 In Rankin County Within The Corporate Limits Of The City Of Pearl, As The "ray Rogers Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate in Rankin County, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Branning,Kirby,England |
2022-03-16 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Massengill,Arnold |
2022-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2022-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Amended |
2022-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2022-01-20 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |