MS HB762 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41, Chapter 492, Laws Of 2020, To Revise The Purposes For Which The Proceeds Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued To Assist The Town Of Wesson, Mississippi, In Paying Certain Costs Associated With The Wesson Old School Visitor Center, May Be Used; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; revise purposes for which bonds authorized for Town of Wesson may be used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |