MS HB724 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 537 In Jones County, Mississippi, As The "winnie Frost Morgan Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 370 In Lee County, Mississippi, As The "dalen Keith Thomas Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 370 In Lee County, Mississippi, As The "leland "l.r." Burcham Memorial Highway"; To Designate An Intersection Of Mississippi Highway 370 In Lee County, Mississippi, As The "lenoise Davidson Memorial Intersection"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate in Jones and Lee Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2019-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-31 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To TR |
2019-01-30 | House | DR - TSDPCS: TR To AP |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |