MS HB722 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 9-7-1, 9-7-3, 9-7-5, 9-7-9, 9-7-13, 9-7-15, 9-7-17, 9-7-19, 9-7-20, 9-7-21, 9-7-23, 9-7-25, 9-7-27, 9-7-29, 9-7-30, 9-7-31, 9-7-32, 9-7-33, 9-7-34, 9-7-41, 9-7-43, 9-7-45, 9-7-46, 9-7-47, 9-7-49, 9-7-53, 9-7-55, 9-7-57 And 9-7-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For Circuit Court Judges, Districts And Terms Of Court For Districts One To Twenty-three, For Purposes Of Amendment; To Amend Sections 9-7-7, 9-7-11, 9-7-14, 9-7-35, 9-7-37, 9-7-39, 9-7-42, 9-7-44, 9-7-51, 9-7-54 And 9-7-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Language In Provisions Of Law For Circuit Court Districts; To Bring Forward Sections 9-5-1, 9-5-3, 9-5-5, 9-5-9, 9-5-15, 9-5-17, 9-5-19, 9-5-21, 9-5-22, 9-5-23, 9-5-27, 9-5-31, 9-5-33, 9-5-35, 9-5-37, 9-5-39, 9-5-40, 9-5-41, 9-5-43, 9-5-45, 9-5-47, 9-5-49, 9-5-51, 9-5-53, 9-5-54, 9-5-55 And 9-5-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For Chancery Court Judges, Districts And Terms Of Court For Districts One To Twenty; To Amend Sections 9-5-7, 9-5-11, 9-5-13, 9-5-25, 9-5-29, 9-5-36, 9-5-38, 9-5-50 And 9-5-58, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Language In Provisions Of Law For Chancery Court Districts; To Create New Sections 9-5-60 And 9-5-62, Which Create The Twenty-first Chancery Court District; To Bring Forward Sections 9-3-1 And 23-15-993, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide The Boundaries And Designated Positions For The Supreme Court; To Bring Forward Section 25-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial districts; revise.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,DeBar |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Hood,Owen |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 993 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 31 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |