MS HB718 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 23-15-805, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That All Campaign Finance Statements, Reports Of Contributions And Expenditures, And Other Reports Required To Be Filed Shall Be Posted Online By The Secretary Of State Within One Day Of Receipt Of Such Reports From The Candidate, Circuit Clerk Or Municipal Clerk; To Amend Section 23-15-815, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance reports; require those filed by all candidates to be available online.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2315805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2315815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback