MS HB704 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide For The Rebate Of A Portion Of Investment And Expenditures Made By Companies Engaged In The Production Of Nationally Distributed Connected Sets Of Television Program Episodes, Consisting Of Not Less Than Two Episodes Made In Mississippi, In Whole Or In Part, For Viewing Through Traditional Television That Is Broadcast Via Cable, Satellite Or Over-the-air Aerial Antenna Systems; Through The Digital Distribution Of Television Content As Streaming Media Over The Internet Through Streaming Platforms, Which May Be Viewed On Digital Devices, Such As A Personal Computer Or Handheld Device; Or Through Dvd Release; To Provide For The Amount Of The Rebates Authorized In This Act; To Define Certain Terms; To Amend Section 57-89-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is A Section Of The Mississippi Motion Picture Incentive Act, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Television series production; provide incentives for certain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Chassaniol,Harkins,Horhn |
2023-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Currie,Creekmore IV,Oliver |
2023-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | Senate | DR - TSDP: TO To FI |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Finance |
2023-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-09 | House | Amended |
2023-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-31 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To TO |
2023-01-25 | House | DR - TSDP: TO To WM |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Tourism;Ways and Means |