MS HB703 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate The Entire Segment Of Interstate 22 That Lies Within The State Of Mississippi, Along With A Portion Of U.s. Highway 78 Located In Byhalia, Desoto County, Mississippi That Extends Northwesterly To Its Point Of Beginning At The Mississippi-tennessee State Line, As The "medal Of Honor Trail"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Medal of Honor Trail"; designate portion of Interstate 22 and U.S. Highway 78 within the State of Mississippi as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2023-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-31 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2023-01-25 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |