MS HB695 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9-23-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Intervention Courts Advisory Committee To Promulgate Rules And Regulations That Allow The Administrative Office Of Courts To Provide Additional Funding To Intervention Courts Based On The Financial Needs Of The Court; To Amend Section 9-23-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Certification Standards For Operation Of An Intervention Court Or Problem Solving Court By Requiring The Provision Of Mental Health Services; To Amend Section 41-113-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Drug Abuse In The Legislative Intent For The Tobacco Education, Prevention And Cessation Program; To Amend Section 41-113-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Duties Of The Office Of Tobacco Control By Adding Fentanyl And Drug Abuse Prevention Education; To Amend Section 41-113-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Duties Of The Director Of The Office Of Tobacco Control To Include Implementation Of A Fentanyl Drug Abuse Education, Prevention And Cessation Program; To Amend Section 41-113-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Duties Of The Office Of Tobacco Control By Adding Fentanyl And Drug Abuse Prevention Education; To Amend Section 41-114-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Vaporizing Devices In The Definition Of "smoke" Or "smoking" For The Provisions Of Law That Restrict Tobacco Use In Public Facilities; To Bring Forward Sections 41-113-9 And 41-113-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Mississippi Tobacco Control Advisory Council And The Tobacco Control Program Fund, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Intervention courts; revise regulations that govern and add drug abuse prevention to statewide education component.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Creekmore [R] | Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 85 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-02 | House | Amended |
2022-01-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 113 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 113 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 113 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 113 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 113 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 113 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 114 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |