MS HB695 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-21-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Matching Funds Requirement For The State Domestic Violence Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Domestic Violence Fund; remove the matching funds requirement for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-02 | Senate | DR - TSDP: JA To AP |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |