MS HB695 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-73-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes An Income Tax Credit For Any Company That Transfers Or Relocates Its National Or Regional Headquarters To The State Of Mississippi From Outside The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; extend repealer on credit for certain costs paid by a company in relocating national or regional headquarters to this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |