MS HB689 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-55-7 And 27-55-507, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Maximum Amount Of Bond That Is Required To Be Posted By Distributors Of Gasoline And Special Fuel; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fuel tax; increase maximum amount of bond that is required to be posted by distributors of gasoline and special fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2017-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB0689.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0689IN.htm |