MS HB637 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Voter Enfranchisement Joint Legislative Study Committee To Examine The Impact Of Nonviolent Offenses On Franchisement; To Study Any Potential Policy Or Law Changes That Would Provide Nonviolent Felons With The Ability To Have Their Right To Vote Restored Upon Completing All Sentencing Requirements, Any Negative Societal Effects That Fall Upon Nonviolent Felons Who Have Completed All Of Their Sentencing Requirements But Have Not Had Their Right To Vote Restored, And Any Policies And Procedures That Have Been Implemented By Other State Legislatures To Restore The Right To Vote To Nonviolent Felons Who Have Completed All Of Their Sentencing Requirements; To Require A Report To The 2020 Regular Session Of The Legislature; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

voter enfranchisement; create joint legislative study committee on.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-03-04SenateDR - TSDP: EL To RU
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Elections;Rules
2019-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-11HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-16HouseReferred To Apportionment and Elections

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback