MS HB637 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Sell And Convey Certain State-owned Real Property Formerly Known As The "old School For The Blind," Located In Jackson, Mississippi; To Require Monies Derived From The Sale Of That Property To Be Deposited Into A Special Fund In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Being Disbursed To The State Board Of Education; To Provide That The State Shall Retain The Right To Repurchase The Real Property If Certain Conditions Occur; To Provide That The State Shall Retain All Mineral Rights To The Real Property Sold Under This Act; To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Review And Consider All Proposals For The Purchase Of The Property Using Certain Reviewing Factors; To Allow The Department Of Finance And Administration To Correct Any Discrepancies In The Legal Description To The Property; To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Sell And Convey Certain State-owned Real Property Located In The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi, In Connection With The Proposed Sale Of The "old School For The Blind Property"; To Amend Sections 27-33-17 And 27-33-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; To Repeal Sections 1, 2 And 3, Chapter 564, Laws Of 2007, Which Authorize The Mississippi Development Authority To Lease The Old School For The Blind Property; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public property; authorize DFA to sell and convey the "Old School for the Blind" property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-18 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
2010-04-20 Veto Referred To Public Property
2010-04-01 Vetoed
2010-03-24 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-24 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-18 Concurred in Amend From Senate
2010-03-10 Returned For Concurrence
2010-03-10 Motion to Reconsider Tabled
2010-03-04 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2010-03-04 Passed As Amended
2010-03-04 Amended
2010-03-01 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-02-18 Referred To Public Property
2010-02-16 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-11 Passed
2010-02-11 Committee Substitute Adopted
2010-02-10 Read the Third Time
2010-02-02 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2010-02-02 DR - TSDPCS: AP To PP
2010-01-26 DR - TSDPCS: PP To AP
2010-01-12 Referred To Public Property;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback