MS HB626 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-7-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Mississippi Supreme Court Shall Conduct An Expedited Judicial Review Of Any Appeal Of An Order Of The Chancery Court Relating To The Issuance Of A Health Care Certificate Of Need; And For Related Purposes.
Title
CON: provide for direct appeals to Court of Appeals of Department of Health orders pertaining to.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-14 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2019-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Point of Order - Well Taken |
2019-02-07 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2019-02-07 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2019-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |