MS HB625 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 1, Chapter 429, Laws Of 2021, To Expand The Pilot Work Release Program, Which Is Authorized For The Sheriff Of Rankin County, To Include The Sheriff Of Harrison County Who May Also Establish Such A Work Release Program For Harrison County; To Extend The Date Of Repeal On This Section From July 1, 2022, To July 1, 2024; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pilot Work Release Program; expand to give authority to Sheriff of Harrison County to establish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred To Corrections |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/history/HB/HB0625.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0625IN.htm |